NH HB1655 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to natural immunity system health and wellness curriculum in schools.
Title
Relative to natural immunity system health and wellness curriculum in schools.
Sponsors
Rep. William Foster [R] | Rep. Richard Littlefield [R] | Rep. Skip Rollins [R] | Rep. Leah Cushman [R] |
Rep. Judy Aron [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-01 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 01/25/2022 08:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/12/2022 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-12-30 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Education |