NH HB1650 | 2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 15 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-21 - Indefinitely Postpone (Rep. Sweeney): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 192-182 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 36
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the approval of alternative programs for granting credit leading to graduation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the approval of alternative programs for granting credit leading to graduation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-03-21 - House - Indefinitely Postpone (Y: 192 N: 182 NV: 8 Abs: 14) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-03-21HouseIndefinitely Postpone (Rep. Sweeney): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 192-182 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 36
2024-03-13HouseCommittee Report: Without Recommendation 03/06/2024 (Vote 10-10; Regular Calendar)
2024-02-22HouseExecutive Session: 03/06/2024 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
2024-02-21HousePublic Hearing: 03/05/2024 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207
2023-12-15HouseIntroduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 28

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback