NH HB165 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-09 - Lay on Table (Rep. Ammon): Motion Adopted DV 204-152 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 89
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-09 - Lay on Table (Rep. Ammon): Motion Adopted DV 204-152 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 89
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to noncompete agreements for certain mental health professionals.
Title
Relative to noncompete agreements for certain mental health professionals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-09 | House | Lay on Table (Rep. Ammon): Motion Adopted DV 204-152 04/09/2021 House Journal 7 P. 89 |
2021-03-03 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2021-03-03 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 10-9; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 64 |
2021-02-02 | House | Executive Session: 02/10/2021 01:25 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95521072179 |
2021-01-26 | House | Public Hearing: 02/02/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following links:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/92235067141 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 37 |