NH HB1649 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 255-41 02/15/2018 House Journal 4 P. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-15 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 255-41 02/15/2018 House Journal 4 P. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the determination of mileage for legislators and legislative officers.
Title
Relative to the determination of mileage for legislators and legislative officers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 255-41 02/15/2018 House Journal 4 P. 38 |
2018-02-09 | House | Special Order to 2/15/2018 Without Objection House Journal 3 P. 81 |
2018-02-08 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Horrigan) 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 2 |
2018-01-26 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/07/2018 (Vote 8-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 12 |
2018-01-26 | House | Executive Session: 01/10/2018 Legislative Office Building 104 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2018 10:45 am Legislative Office Building 104 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Legislative Administration House Journal 1 P. 18 |