NH HB1647 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2022 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-04-21 - Refer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the calculation of child support.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the calculation of child support.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-03-31 - House - Table (Y: 155 N: 179 NV: 23 Abs: 33) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-04-21SenateRefer to Interim Study, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9
2022-04-14SenateCommittee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 04/21/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 16
2022-04-06SenateHearing: 04/12/2022, Room 100, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 15
2022-04-05SenateIntroduced 03/31/2022 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 8
2022-03-31HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2022-1171h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/31/2022 House Journal 9
2022-03-31HouseAmendment # 2022-1171h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/31/2022 House Journal 9
2022-03-31HouseLay HB1647 on Table (Rep. Altschiller): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 155-179 03/31/2022 House Journal 9
2022-03-24HouseMinority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study
2022-03-24HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1171h (Vote 12-9; Regular Calendar)
2022-03-18House==CONTINUED== Division III Work Session: 03/21/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203
2022-03-14HouseDivision Work Session: 03/14/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212
2022-03-09HouseExecutive Session: 03/23/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2022-03-04HouseReferred to Finance 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
2022-03-04HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2022-0566h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
2022-02-16HouseAmendment # 2022-0566h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
2022-02-10HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0566h (Vote 8-7; Regular Calendar)
2022-02-10HouseExecutive Session: 02/09/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
2022-01-28House==CONTINUED== Public Hearing: 02/09/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208
2022-01-27HousePublic Hearing: 02/08/2022 10:00 am State House Reps Hall
2021-12-27HouseIntroduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Children and Family Law

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback