NH HB1646 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 15
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring reports of dropped cell phone calls by carriers.
Title
Requiring reports of dropped cell phone calls by carriers.
Sponsors
Rep. Mindi Messmer [D] | Rep. Chuck Grassie [D] | Rep. James McConnell [R] | Rep. Ellen Read [D] |
Rep. Henry Marsh [R] | Rep. Tamara Le [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 15 |
2018-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/22/2018 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 12 |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2018 Legislative Office Building 304 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 1 P. 18 |