NH HB1645 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 165-139 03/17/2022 House Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-17 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 165-139 03/17/2022 House Journal 8
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring notification to renewable energy customer-generators of issues related to renewable energy credits.
Title
Requiring notification to renewable energy customer-generators of issues related to renewable energy credits.
Sponsors
Rep. Lee Oxenham [D] | Rep. Rebecca McWilliams [D] | Rep. Roderick Pimentel [D] | Rep. Troy Merner [R] |
Sen. Suzanne Prentiss [D] | Sen. David Watters [D] | Rep. Kat McGhee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted DV 165-139 03/17/2022 House Journal 8 |
2022-03-07 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2022-03-07 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 12-10; Regular Calendar) |
2022-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2022 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2022-02-28 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/01/2022 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2022-01-19 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2022 02:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2021-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy |