NH HB1644 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-5)
Status: Passed on June 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-20 - Signed by Governor Hassan 06/15/2016; Chapter 262; I. Sec. 2 eff. as prov. in sec. 3 ; II. Sec. 3 eff. 6/15/2016 ; III. Sec. 4 eff. 7/1/2016 at 12:01 a.m. ; IV. Rem. eff. 8/14/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to screening and intervention for dyslexia and related disorders, establishing a reading specialist position in the department of education, and making a technical correction.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to screening and intervention for dyslexia and related disorders, establishing a reading specialist position in the department of education, and making a technical correction.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2016-02-10 - House - OTP (Y: 186 N: 172 NV: 15 Abs: 26) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2016-06-20HouseSigned by Governor Hassan 06/15/2016; Chapter 262; I. Sec. 2 eff. as prov. in sec. 3 ; II. Sec. 3 eff. 6/15/2016 ; III. Sec. 4 eff. 7/1/2016 at 12:01 a.m. ; IV. Rem. eff. 8/14/2016
2016-06-07SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20
2016-06-07HouseEnrolled 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 61
2016-06-03HouseEnrolled Bill Amendment #2016-2130e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 06/01/2016 House Journal 42 P. 58
2016-06-03SenateEnrolled Bill Amendment #2016-2130e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/01/2016); Senate Journal 20
2016-05-19HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1614s (Reps. Ladd, Kurk): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/19/2016 House Journal 39 P. 10
2016-05-05SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 1614s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/05/2016; Senate Journal 16
2016-05-05SenateCommittee Amendment 1614s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/05/2016 Senate Journal 16
2016-05-05SenateWithout Objection, Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment #2016-1614s, 2/3 Necessary, Motion Adopted; 05/05/2016; Senate Journal 16
2016-05-05SenateChair Ruled Non-Germane Amendment, 05/05/2016 Senate Journal 16
2016-04-27SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1614s, 05/05/2016; Senate Calendar 17
2016-04-21SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 1472s, New Title, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/21/2016; Senate Journal 14
2016-04-21SenateSen. Reagan Floor Amendment #2016-1472s, New Title, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/21/2016; Senate Journal 14
2016-04-13SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/21/2016; Senate Calendar 15
2016-04-06SenateHearing: 04/12/2016, Room 103, Legislative Office Building, 09:10 am; Senate Calendar 14
2016-03-30SenateIntroduced 03/24/2016 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 11
2016-03-23HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 1092h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/23/2016 House Journal 27 P. 3
2016-03-23HouseAmendment #2016-1092h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/23/2016 House Journal 27 P. 3
2016-03-17HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2016-1092h (NT) for 03/23/2016 (Vote 26-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 19 P. 4
2016-03-08HouseExecutive Session: 03/16/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211
2016-03-03HouseDivision II Work Session: 03/15/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 209
2016-03-03House==CONTINUED== Division II Work Session: 03/03/2016 09:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 209
2016-03-03House==RECESSED== Division II Work Session: 03/02/2016 03:15 PM Legislative Office Building 209
2016-02-23House==CANCELLED== Division II Work Session: 03/02/2016 03:00 PM Legislative Office Building 209
2016-02-10HouseReferred to Finance 02/10/2016 House Journal 16 P. 18
2016-02-10HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 186-172 02/10/2016 House Journal 16 P. 16
2016-02-05HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate House Calendar 7 P. 9
2016-02-05HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/10/2016 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 9
2016-01-13HouseExecutive Session: 01/26/2016 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building207
2016-01-13HousePublic Hearing: 01/12/2016 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building207
2016-02-11HouseIntroduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Education House Journal 4 P. 21

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback