NH HB1644 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - House Signed By Governor 05/02/2012; Effective 07/01/2012; Chapter 0041
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-03 - House Signed By Governor 05/02/2012; Effective 07/01/2012; Chapter 0041
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the regulation of individual home health care service providers by the department of health and human services.
Title
Relative to the regulation of individual home health care service providers by the department of health and human services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-03 | House Signed By Governor 05/02/2012; Effective 07/01/2012; Chapter 0041 | |
2012-04-18 | Senate Enrolled; Senate Journal 11, Pg.383 | |
2012-04-11 | House Enrolled | |
2012-04-11 | Senate Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; Senate Journal 9, Pg.350 | |
2012-04-03 | Senate Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 4/11/12; Senate Calendar 14 | |
2012-03-23 | Senate Hearing: 3/29/12, Room 102, Legislative Office Building, 1:50 p.m.; Senate Calendar 12 | |
2012-03-07 | Senate Introduced and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 7, Pg.187 | |
2012-03-07 | House Ought to Pass with Amendment #0947h(NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1308 | |
2012-03-07 | House Amendment #0947h(NT) Adopted, Voice Vote; House Journal 21, PG.1308 | |
2012-02-23 | House Proposed Committee Amendment #2012-0947h (New Title); House Calendar 17, PG.1017 | |
2012-02-23 | House Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #0947h(NT) for Mar 7 (Vote 17-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 18, PG.1068 | |
2012-02-16 | House Executive Session: 2/21/2012 10:45 PM Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2012-02-08 | House Subcommittee Work Session: 2/14/2012 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211 ==TIME CHANGE (Orig 2:00 PM)== | |
2011-12-27 | House Public Hearing: 2/7/2012 11:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 205 | |
2011-12-20 | House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs; House Journal 7, PG.362 |