NH HB1644 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-17 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 219-122; House Journal 18, PG.981-983
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Failed on February 17 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-17 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 219-122; House Journal 18, PG.981-983
Summary
Including "unborn child" in the definition of "another" for the purpose of first and second degree murder, manslaughter, and negligent homicide.
Title
Including "unborn child" in the definition of "another" for the purpose of first and second degree murder, manslaughter, and negligent homicide.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-17 | House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 219-122; House Journal 18, PG.981-983 | |
2010-02-10 | House Special Ordered to Beginning of Feb 17 Regular Calendar: Motion Adopted Without Objection; House Journal 16, PG.783 | |
2010-02-04 | House Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass; House Calendar 13, PG.535 | |
2010-02-04 | House Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 10 Regular Calendar (Vote 14-5); House Calendar 13, PG.535 | |
2010-01-26 | House Executive Session: 2/2/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 (Continued 2/2/2010 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 204 if Necessary) | |
2010-01-12 | House Public Hearing: 1/19/2010 1:00 PM Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2038&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |