NH HB164 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-14 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to prohibiting towns from criminalizing the right to peacefully and orderly assemble.
Title
Relative to prohibiting towns from criminalizing the right to peacefully and orderly assemble.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Hynes [R] | Rep. Tony Lekas [R] | Rep. Jason Janvrin [R] | Rep. Brandon Phinney [L] |
Rep. Kristin Noble [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-14 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 |
2023-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB164 01/30/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 8 |
2023-01-24 | House | Executive Session: 01/30/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2023 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Judiciary |