NH HB164 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/10/2021; Chapter 184; Eff: 10/09/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-08-16 - Signed by Governor Sununu 08/10/2021; Chapter 184; Eff: 10/09/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the acquisition, sale, or demolition of municipal land or buildings.
Title
Relative to the acquisition, sale, or demolition of municipal land or buildings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-08-16 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 08/10/2021; Chapter 184; Eff: 10/09/2021 |
2021-07-23 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/24/2021 |
2021-07-21 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-07-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-2063eba: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 06/24/2021 House Journal 11 |
2021-07-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2021-2063e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/24/2021); Senate Journal 20 |
2021-06-10 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment 2021-1145s (Rep. Dolan): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 06/10/2021 House Journal 10 P. 13 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2021-1145s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 04/22/2021; Senate Journal 12 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2021-1145s, Regular Calendar 23Y-1N, Amendment Adopted; 04/22/2021; Senate Journal 12 |
2021-04-16 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-1145s, 04/22/2021; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 20 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Remote Hearing: 04/15/2021, 09:15 am; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 19 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Introduced 04/01/2021 and Referred to Election Law and Municipal Affairs; Senate Journal 11 |
2021-04-07 | House | Reconsider (Rep. Osborne): Motion Failed Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 50 |
2021-04-07 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 43 |
2021-02-25 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 20 |
2021-01-27 | House | Executive Session: 02/08/2021 02:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96815613466 |
2021-01-21 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2021 11:00 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/95927066667 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Municipal and County Government House Journal 2 P. 37 |