NH HB1635 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Interim Study Work Session Work Session: 05/24/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-11 - Interim Study Work Session Work Session: 05/24/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the purchase of output of limited electrical energy producers and including qualifying storage system.
Title
Relative to the purchase of output of limited electrical energy producers and including qualifying storage system.
Sponsors
Rep. Kat McGhee [D] | Rep. Walter Stapleton [R] | Rep. Dan Wolf [R] | Rep. James Allard [R] |
Rep. Troy Merner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-11 | House | Interim Study Work Session Work Session: 05/24/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306-308 |
2022-03-17 | House | Refer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/17/2022 House Journal 8 |
2022-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study (Vote 18-4; Regular Calendar) |
2022-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2022 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2022-02-01 | House | Public Hearing: 02/01/2022 3:30 p.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2021-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy |