NH HB1635 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-08-19 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/22/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/97236261808 - Executive Session to Follow
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring climate education in grade and secondary schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring climate education in grade and secondary schools.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-19HouseFull Committee Work Session: 09/22/2020 10:00 am Members of the public may attend using this link: : https://www.zoom.us/j/97236261808 - Executive Session to Follow
2020-03-12HouseRefer for Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/12/2020 House Journal 8 P. 48
2020-03-03HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2020-03-03HouseMajority Committee Report: Refer for Interim Study for 03/11/2020 (Vote 13-7; Regular Calendar)
2020-02-18HouseExecutive Session: 02/26/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2020-02-05HousePublic Hearing: 02/13/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-12-11HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 29

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback