NH HB1634 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Referred to Finance 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-17 - Referred to Finance 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to state grants for researching the effects on the human body of COVID-19 vaccines.
Title
Relative to state grants for researching the effects on the human body of COVID-19 vaccines.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | House | Referred to Finance 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-16 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-10 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-02-01 | House | Executive Session: 01/24/2022 04:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/11/2022 02:45 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2021-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |