NH HB1634 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on December 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to certain additional part-time employment of retirees in the retirement system.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to certain additional part-time employment of retirees in the retirement system.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020
2020-02-12HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/19/2020 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 9
2020-01-29HouseExecutive Session: 02/05/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 306
2020-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 01/21/2020 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 306
2019-12-11HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 29

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback