NH HB1633 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on December 10 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0846h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 219-104 03/11/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to insurance coverage for tick-borne illness.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to insurance coverage for tick-borne illness.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-11 - House - OTPA (Y: 219 N: 104 NV: 31 Abs: 42) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0846h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 219-104 03/11/2020
2020-03-11HouseAmendment # 2020-0846h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020
2020-03-05HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0846h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 12-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 41
2020-02-20HouseExecutive Session: 03/03/2020 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2020-02-20House==TIME CHANGE== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/24/2020 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 302
2020-02-12HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/18/2020 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302
2020-01-29HousePublic Hearing: 02/05/2020 01:15 pm Legislative Office Building 302
2019-12-10HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 1 P. 29

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback