NH HB163 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/04/2023; Chapter 16; eff: 07/03/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/04/2023; Chapter 16; eff: 07/03/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to authorized license plate decals.
Title
Relative to authorized license plate decals.
Sponsors
Rep. John Sellers [R] | Rep. John Lewicke [R] | Rep. Diane Pauer [R] | Rep. Lex Berezhny [R] |
Rep. James Tierney [R] | Sen. Kevin Avard [R] | Sen. Daniel Innis [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/04/2023; Chapter 16; eff: 07/03/2023 |
2023-05-02 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 04/06/2023 |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 04/13/2023); Senate Journal 14 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/13/2023; Senate Journal 13 |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/13/2023; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Hearing: 03/28/2023, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 01:40 pm; Senate Calendar 15 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced 02/22/2023 and Referred to Transportation; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-02-14 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 |
2023-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass 02/07/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 11 |
2023-02-03 | House | Executive Session: 02/07/2023 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-01-25 | House | Public Hearing: 01/31/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Transportation |