NH HB1628 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2024; Chapter 252; eff. 09/17/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-07-26 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2024; Chapter 252; eff. 09/17/2024
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to regulatory authority for apples, coal grading, potatoes, cider, milk, and lumber.
Title
Relative to regulatory authority for apples, coal grading, potatoes, cider, milk, and lumber.
Sponsors
Rep. Peter Bixby [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-07-26 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/19/2024; Chapter 252; eff. 09/17/2024 |
2024-07-02 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 06/13/2024 House Journal 16 |
2024-07-02 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-06-25 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2313e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 06/13/2024 House Journal 16 |
2024-06-21 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2024-2313e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 06/13/2024); Senate Journal 18 |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/15/2024; Senate Journal 12 |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Special Order to Beginning of Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/15/2024; Senate Journal 12 |
2024-05-07 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/16/2024, Vote 4-0; Senate Calendar 19 |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Hearing: 05/07/2024, Room 103, State House, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 18 |
2024-03-26 | Senate | Introduced 03/21/2024 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 8 |
2024-03-21 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2024-0956h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 4 |
2024-03-21 | House | Amendment # 2024-0956h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/21/2024 House Journal 9 P. 4 |
2024-03-13 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2024-0956h 03/06/2024 (Vote 12-0; Consent Calendar) |
2024-03-13 | House | Executive Session: 03/06/2024 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2024-02-21 | House | Public Hearing: 03/06/2024 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 301-303 |
2023-12-15 | House | Introduced 01/03/2024 and referred to Environment and Agriculture House Journal 1 P. 27 |