NH HB1627 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2022; Chapter 309; eff. 07/01/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2022; Chapter 309; eff. 07/01/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing an education freedom account program administrator in the department of education and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Establishing an education freedom account program administrator in the department of education and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-21 - Senate - Floor Amendment (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - OTPA (Y: 204 N: 131 NV: 22 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - Adopt Floor Amendment (Y: 76 N: 258 NV: 24 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
2022-03-31 - House - Table (Y: 152 N: 181 NV: 25 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
2022-03-31 - House - Table (Y: 161 N: 177 NV: 19 Abs: 33) [FAIL]
2022-03-31 - House - OTPA (Y: 204 N: 131 NV: 22 Abs: 33) [PASS]
2022-03-31 - House - Adopt Floor Amendment (Y: 76 N: 258 NV: 24 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
2022-03-31 - House - Table (Y: 152 N: 181 NV: 25 Abs: 32) [FAIL]
2022-03-31 - House - Table (Y: 161 N: 177 NV: 19 Abs: 33) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-07 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2022; Chapter 309; eff. 07/01/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-06-22 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-26 | House | Conference Committee Report 2022-2059c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Conference Committee Report # 2022-2059c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/26/2022; Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-19 | Senate | Conference Committee Report Filed, # 2022-2059c; 05/26/2022 |
2022-05-17 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 05/17/2022 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Ward, Bradley, Prentiss; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Ward Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2022-1836s 2022-1673s and Requests CofC (Reps. Ladd, Cordelli, Weyler, Mullen): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/05/2022 House Journal 12 |
2022-05-06 | House | Referred to Finance 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1836s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1836s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1836s, 05/05/2022; Senate Calendar 18 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1673s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Sen. Ward Floor Amendment # 2022-1673s, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Amendment Adopted; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Sen. Bradley Moved Ought to Pass; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Refer to Interim Study, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 04/21/2022; Senate Journal 9 |
2022-04-14 | Senate | Committee Report: Referred to Interim Study, 04/21/2022; Senate Calendar 16 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Hearing: 04/12/2022, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:30 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Introduced 03/31/2022 and Referred to Education; Senate Journal 8 |
2022-04-01 | House | FLAM # 1282h (Rep. Johnson): Amendment Failed DV 60-270 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-04-01 | House | FLAM # 1259h (Rep. Comtois): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 76-258 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-04-01 | House | FLAM # 1252h (Rep. Prout): Amendment Failed DV 89-241 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-03-31 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1163h: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 204-131 03/31/2022 |
2022-03-31 | House | Lay HB1627 on Table (Rep. Spillane): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 152-181 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-03-31 | House | FLAM # 2022-1248h (Rep. Blasek): Amendment Failed DV 95-235 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-03-31 | House | FLAM # 2022-1246h (Rep. Sylvia): Amendment Failed DV 78-247 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-03-31 | House | Lay HB1627 on Table (Rep. Plett): Motion Failed Regular Calendar 161-177 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-03-31 | House | Amendment # 2022-1163h: Amendment Adopted DV 182-148 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-03-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1163h (NT) (Vote 17-3; Regular Calendar) |
2022-03-14 | House | Division Work Session: 03/21/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 209 |
2022-03-09 | House | Executive Session: 03/23/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-03-02 | House | Public Hearing on non-germane Amendment # 2022-0875h: 03/08/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-03-01 | House | ==CANCELLED== Division II Subcommittee Work Session: 03/15/2022 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-02-16 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-01 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 18-1; Consent Calendar) |
2022-01-25 | House | Executive Session: 01/25/2022 08:00 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2022-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2022 11:15 am Legislative Office Building 205-207 |
2021-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Education |