NH HB1626 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on June 5 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-05 - Enrolled 05/23/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the governor's commission on alcohol and drug abuse prevention, treatment, and recovery to report on the cost effectiveness of funded programs, and relative to liquor commission shortfalls.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring the governor's commission on alcohol and drug abuse prevention, treatment, and recovery to report on the cost effectiveness of funded programs, and relative to liquor commission shortfalls.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-03 - House - Sen. Sanborn Floor Amendment 1912s (Y: 11 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-05HouseEnrolled 05/23/2018
2018-06-04SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/23/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-23HouseConference Committee Report 2053c: Adopted, Voice Vote 05/23/2018
2018-05-23SenateConference Committee Report # 2018-2053c, Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/23/2018; Senate Journal 18
2018-05-17SenateConference Committee Report Filed, # 2018-2053c; 05/17/2018
2018-05-14House==CONTINUED== Conference Committee Meeting: 05/16/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 212
2018-05-10House==RECESSED== Conference Committee Meeting: 05/14/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 212
2018-05-10SenatePresident Appoints: Senators Daniels, Sanborn, Soucy; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17
2018-05-10SenateSen. Daniels Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/10/2018; Senate Journal 17
2018-05-10HouseSpeaker Appoints: Reps. L. Ober, Emerick, Lovejoy, Hunt 05/10/2018
2018-05-10HouseHouse Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 1920s and 1928s and Requests CofC (Rep. Kurk): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/10/2018
2018-05-04SenateWithout Objection, the Clerk is authorized to make technical and administrative corrections which are necessary to reflect the intent of the Senate, Motion Adopted; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-03SenateOught to Pass with Amendments 2018-1920s and 2018-1928s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-03SenateSen. Feltes Floor Amendment # 2018-1928s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-03SenateSen. Feltes Moved to Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-03SenatePending Motion OT3rdg; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-03SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1920s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-03SenateSen. Feltes Moved Laid on Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-03SenateSen. Soucy Floor Amendment # 2018-1920s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-03SenateSen. Sanborn Floor Amendment # 2018-1912s, Regular Calendar 11Y-13N, Amendment Failed; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-03SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-1779s, Amendment Failed, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-03SenateWithout Objection, Rule 3-17 is Suspended to Allow Non-Germane Amendment # 2018-1779s; 2/3 Necessary, Motion Adopted; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-03SenateChair Ruled Sections of Amendment # 2018-1779s Non-Germane, 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-02SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1779s, 05/03/2018;
2018-05-02SenateSpecial Order to 05/03/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2018 Senate Journal 15
2018-04-25SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1779s, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19
2018-04-12SenateHearing: 04/17/2018, Room 103, State House, 01:00 pm, on proposed amendment # 2018-1417s; Senate Calendar 17
2018-03-22SenateHearing: 03/27/2018, Room 103, State House, 01:45 pm; Senate Calendar 14
2018-03-14SenateIntroduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Finance; Senate Journal 7
2018-03-07HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0794h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2018 House Journal 7 P. 13
2018-03-07HouseAmendment # 2018-0794h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/07/2018 House Journal 7 P. 13
2018-02-28HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2018-02-28HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0794h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 14-10; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 54
2018-02-14HouseExecutive Session: 02/21/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2018-02-13House==CONTINUED== Division III Work Session: 02/20/2018 01:30 PM Legislative Office Building 210-211
2018-02-06House==RECESSED== Division III Work Session: 02/13/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 212
2018-01-23House==RECESSED== Division III Work Session: 02/06/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2018-01-17HouseDivision III Work Session: 01/23/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2018-01-10HouseDivision III Work Session: 01/18/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/10/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211
2017-11-13HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Finance House Journal 1 P. 18

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback