NH HB1625 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to digital foot scanning at hospitals.
Title
Relative to digital foot scanning at hospitals.
Sponsors
Rep. Neal Kurk [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-22 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 13 |
2018-02-08 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/22/2018 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 10 |
2018-02-08 | House | Executive Session: 01/31/2018 Legislative Office Building 205 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/30/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 18 |