NH HB1624 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to state procurement practices and criteria for acceptance of bids.
Title
Relative to state procurement practices and criteria for acceptance of bids.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-19 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13 |
2018-04-11 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 04/19/2018; Senate Calendar 17 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Hearing: 04/11/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 195-138 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 82 |
2018-02-26 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 8-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 40 |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-02-21 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/26/2018 02:30 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 17 |