NH HB1622 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 81; Eff. 5/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 81; Eff. 5/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to organization of the department of information technology.
Title
Relative to organization of the department of information technology.
Sponsors
Rep. Lynne Ober [R] | Rep. Daniel Eaton [D] | Rep. Tracy Emerick [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
Sen. John Reagan [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 81; Eff. 5/25/2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/12/2018; Senate Journal 12 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/12/2018; Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Hearing: 04/04/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:10 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0192h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 10 |
2018-02-22 | House | Amendment # 2018-0192h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 10 |
2018-02-14 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0192h for 02/22/2018 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 9 |
2018-02-14 | House | Executive Session: 01/24/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2018 02:45 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 17 |