NH HB1620 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-02 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-02 - Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to electric vehicle parking spaces.
Title
Relative to electric vehicle parking spaces.
Sponsors
Rep. Skip Cleaver [D] | Rep. Janice Schmidt [D] | Rep. Laura Telerski [D] | Rep. Casey Conley [D] |
Rep. Suzanne Vail [D] | Rep. Amanda Bouldin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-02 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 5 |
2020-05-07 | House | Executive Session: 05/12/2020 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link: https://zoom.us/j/91719044913 |
2020-03-11 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/17/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2020-03-11 | House | ==CANCELLED== Full Committee Work Session: 03/16/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2020-03-04 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/09/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2020-02-26 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Full Committee Work Session: 03/05/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2020-02-26 | House | Public Hearing: 03/04/2020 03:15 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Ways and Means 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 91 |
2020-02-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0192h: Motion Adopted DV 197-122 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 91 |
2020-02-19 | House | Amendment # 2020-0192h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 91 |
2020-02-05 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0192h for 02/19/2020 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 26 |
2020-01-29 | House | ==CONTINUED== Executive Session: 02/04/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2020-01-21 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/28/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2020-01-08 | House | ==RECESSED== Executive Session: 01/15/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2020-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/14/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 29 |