NH HB162 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/04/2023; Chapter 15; eff: 07/03/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-08 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/04/2023; Chapter 15; eff: 07/03/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to supported decision making.
Title
Relative to supported decision making.
Sponsors
Rep. Maureen Mooney [R] | Rep. Glenn Cordelli [R] | Rep. Bill Boyd [R] | Rep. Jeanine Notter [R] |
Sen. Kevin Avard [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/04/2023; Chapter 15; eff: 07/03/2023 |
2023-04-26 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 04/06/2023 |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 04/13/2023); Senate Journal 14 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/30/2023; Senate Journal 12 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 03/30/2023; Senate Calendar 15 |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Hearing: 03/21/2023, Room 100, State House, 02:00 pm; Senate Calendar 14 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Introduced 02/22/2023 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 9 |
2023-02-14 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2023-0116h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 |
2023-02-14 | House | Amendment # 2023-0116h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2023 House Journal 5 |
2023-02-12 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2023-0116h 01/30/2023 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 8 |
2023-01-24 | House | Executive Session: 01/30/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/18/2023 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 206-208 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Judiciary |