NH HB162 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on July 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-03 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2019; Chapter 150; Eff: 08/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Repealing the requirement for the inspection of timber.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repealing the requirement for the inspection of timber.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-07-03HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/01/2019; Chapter 150; Eff: 08/30/2019
2019-06-12HouseEnrolled 06/06/2019 House Journal 18 P. 47
2019-06-12SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/06/2019); Senate Journal 20
2019-05-23SenateOught to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/23/2019; Senate Journal 17
2019-05-15SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/23/2019; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar Senate Calendar 23
2019-03-21SenateHearing: 03/26/2019, Room 103, State House, 09:45 am; Senate Calendar 15
2019-03-12SenateIntroduced 03/07/2019 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 8
2019-02-14HouseOught to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 21
2019-01-31HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass for 02/14/2019 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 11
2019-01-23HouseExecutive Session: 01/29/2019 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2019-01-08HousePublic Hearing: 01/15/2019 02:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305
2018-12-27HouseIntroduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 2 P. 39

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback