NH HB1619 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on December 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-20 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/13/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
Pending: House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Committee
Status: Introduced on December 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-09-20 - House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/13/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
Pending: House Criminal Justice and Public Safety Committee
Summary
Requiring law enforcement officers to record interviews of suspects in felony cases.
Title
Requiring law enforcement officers to record interviews of suspects in felony cases.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-20 | House Interim Study - Executive Session: 10/13/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2010-06-15 | House Interim Study - Subcommittee Work Session: 9/9/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2010-03-17 | House Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety for Interim Study; House Journal 26, PG.1365 | |
2010-02-17 | House Refer to Interim Study: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 18, PG.936 | |
2010-02-10 | House Special Ordered to Regular Place in Feb 17 Consent Calendar: Motion Adopted Without Objection; House Journal 16, PG.783 | |
2010-02-10 | House Removed from Consent Calendar (Rep Vaillancourt); House Journal 16, PG.748 | |
2010-02-03 | House Committee Report: Refer to Interim Study for Feb 10 Consent Calendar (vote 17-0); House Calendar 13, PG.524 | |
2010-01-26 | House Executive Session: 2/2/2010 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 (Continued 2/2/2010 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 204 if Necessary) | |
2010-01-12 | House Public Hearing: 1/21/2010 1:30 PM Legislative Office Building 204 | |
2009-12-10 | House Introduced 1/6/2010 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 6, PG.246 |
New Hampshire State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/legacy/bs2016/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2375&sy=2010&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2010&q=1 |