NH HB1618 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-13 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to fines for littering on public ways.
Title
Relative to fines for littering on public ways.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/13/2020 House Journal 3 P. 5 |
2020-01-15 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/13/2020 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 4 |
2020-01-08 | House | Executive Session: 01/15/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2020-01-08 | House | Public Hearing: 01/14/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 203 |
2019-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Transportation House Journal 1 P. 29 |