NH HB1617 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-22 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 13
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to definitions regarding immunization requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to definitions regarding immunization requirements.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-22HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/22/2018 House Journal 5 P. 13
2018-02-08HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/22/2018 (Vote 19-2; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 10
2018-01-26HouseExecutive Session: 01/25/2018 Legislative Office Building 205
2018-01-10HousePublic Hearing: 01/24/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 205
2017-11-13HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs House Journal 1 P. 17

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback