NH HB1614 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-19 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the penalties for use or possession of a controlled drug.
Title
Relative to the penalties for use or possession of a controlled drug.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 5 |
2020-01-29 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/19/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 4 |
2020-01-09 | House | Executive Session: 01/28/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/21/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 204 |
2019-12-06 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety House Journal 1 P. 28 |