NH HB1611 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 169-150 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 107
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 169-150 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 107
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing a committee to study off-shore wind energy development.
Title
Establishing a committee to study off-shore wind energy development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - ITL (Y: 169 N: 150 NV: 44 Abs: 29) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 169-150 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 107 |
2018-02-21 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2018-02-21 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 11-8; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 47 |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/06/2018 Legislative Office Building 304 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 304 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy House Journal 1 P. 17 |