NH HB161 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-05-27 - Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to the calculation of child support.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to the calculation of child support.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-27SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote === BILL KILLED ===; 05/27/2021; Senate Journal 17
2021-05-25SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; 05/27/2021; Senate Calendar 25A
2021-04-28SenateRemote Hearing: 05/03/2021, 01:15 pm; Links to join the hearing can be found in the Senate Calendar; Senate Calendar 22
2021-04-13SenateIntroduced 04/08/2021 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 12
2021-04-07HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2021-0549h: Motion Adopted DV 199-175 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 132
2021-04-07HouseAmendment # 2021-0549h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 04/07/2021 House Journal 5 P. 132
2021-03-15HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2021-03-15HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2021-0549h (Vote 8-7; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 18 P. 32
2021-03-11HouseExecutive Session: 03/11/2021 09:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/91927749754
2021-01-27HousePublic Hearing: 02/03/2021 10:30 am Members of the public may attend using the following link:To join the webinar: https://www.zoom.us/j/96640856922 / Executive session on pending legislation may be held throughout the day (time permitting) from the time the committee is initially convened.
2021-01-04HouseIntroduced (in recess of) 01/06/2021 and referred to Children and Family Law House Journal 2 P. 37

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback