NH HB1606 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/24/2022; Chapter 270; 07/01/2023 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on June 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/24/2022; Chapter 270; 07/01/2023 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to administration of the state immunization registry.
Title
Relative to administration of the state immunization registry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-05 - Senate - Ought to Pass w/Amendment (Y: 13 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/24/2022; Chapter 270; 07/01/2023 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-15 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. M. Pearson): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1687s, Regular Calendar 13Y-10N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-06 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1687s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Special Order to after the Bills removed from the Consent Calendar, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1687s, 05/05/2022; Senate Calendar 18 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Special Order to to the next session, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1687s, 04/28/2022; Senate Calendar 17 |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Hearing: 04/06/2022, Room 100, State House, 12:00 pm; Senate Calendar 14 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2022 and Referred to Health and Human Services; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-16 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0919h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-16 | House | Amendment # 2022-0919h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/15/2022 House Journal 6 |
2022-03-08 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0919h (Vote 20-1; Consent Calendar) |
2022-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/07/2022 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-02-03 | House | Public Hearing: 02/15/2022 10:15 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2021-12-22 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Health, Human Services and Elderly Affairs |