NH HB1603 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on December 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-02 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-02 - Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishing the per and polyfluoroalkyl substances contamination remediation and mitigation revolving loan and grant program and fund.
Title
Establishing the per and polyfluoroalkyl substances contamination remediation and mitigation revolving loan and grant program and fund.
Sponsors
Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Rep. Nancy Murphy [D] | Rep. Michael Edgar [D] | Rep. David Meuse [D] |
Rep. Rosemarie Rung [D] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-02 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 23 P. 5 |
2020-05-07 | House | Executive Session: 05/12/2020 01:00 pm Members of the public may attend using the following link: https://zoom.us/j/91719044913 |
2020-03-11 | House | ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 03/17/2020 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2020-03-04 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 03/09/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2020-02-26 | House | ==TIME CHANGE== Full Committee Work Session: 03/05/2020 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 202 |
2020-02-26 | House | Public Hearing: 03/04/2020 01:45 pm Legislative Office Building 202 |
2020-02-19 | House | Referred to Ways and Means 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 20 |
2020-02-19 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2020-0232h (NT): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 20 |
2020-02-19 | House | Amendment # 2020-0232h (NT): Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/19/2020 House Journal 4 P. 20 |
2020-01-29 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0232h (NT) for 02/19/2020 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 7 P. 14 |
2020-01-23 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/28/2020 09:50 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2020-01-14 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/21/2020 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 305 |
2020-01-13 | House | Executive Session: 01/28/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2020-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/14/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305 |
2019-12-04 | House | Introduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 1 P. 28 |