NH HB1600 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 38
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to objections to proposed rules by the joint legislative committee on administrative rules.
Title
Relative to objections to proposed rules by the joint legislative committee on administrative rules.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 38 |
2018-02-26 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 11-1; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 21 |
2018-02-26 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-02-01 | House | ==ROOM CHANGE== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/13/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 202 |
2018-01-23 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/30/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-01-10 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 17 |