NH HB1599 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2022; Chapter 308; eff. 08/30/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2022; Chapter 308; eff. 08/30/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to customer generators who sell renewable energy certificates.
Title
Relative to customer generators who sell renewable energy certificates.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-07 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 07/01/2022; Chapter 308; eff. 08/30/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-22 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-06-22 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-15 | House | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-2115e: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote (in recess of) 05/26/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-06-15 | Senate | Enrolled Bill Amendment # 2022-2115e Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess of 05/26/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-13 | House | House Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Vose): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/12/2022 House Journal 12 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1841s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Sen. Perkins Kwoka Floor Amendment # 2022-1841s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Sen. Perkins Kwoka Moved Ought to Pass; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Inexpedient to Legislate, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-19 | Senate | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 04/28/2022; Senate Calendar 17 |
2022-03-31 | Senate | Hearing: 04/05/2022, Room 103, State House, 09:20 am; Senate Calendar 14 |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Introduced 03/17/2022 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 6 |
2022-03-17 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted DV 163-137 03/17/2022 House Journal 8 |
2022-03-07 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 13-9; Regular Calendar) |
2022-03-01 | House | Executive Session: 03/01/2022 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2022-02-08 | House | Public Hearing: 02/08/2022 10:00 a.m. Legislative Office Building306-308 |
2021-12-21 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy |