NH HB1599 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 79; Eff. 5/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 29 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 79; Eff. 5/25/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the governor's commission on disability.
Title
Relative to the governor's commission on disability.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-29 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 05/25/2018; Chapter 79; Eff. 5/25/2018 |
2018-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 04/26/2018); Senate Journal 15 |
2018-05-01 | House | Enrolled 04/26/2018 |
2018-04-12 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/12/2018; Senate Journal 12 |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/12/2018; Senate Calendar 16 |
2018-03-29 | Senate | Hearing: 04/04/2018, Room 101, Legislative Office Building, 10:20 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 38 |
2018-02-23 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass for 03/06/2018 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 21 |
2018-02-23 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2018 Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-02-20 | House | ==CANCELLED== Subcommittee Work Session: 02/21/2018 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-01-30 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/31/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-01-24 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/25/2018 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 306 |
2018-01-03 | House | Public Hearing: 01/10/2018 02:00 PM Legislative Office Building 306 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration House Journal 1 P. 16 |