NH HB1596 | 2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-09 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 46
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Changing the marriage license requirement to a requirement that couples obtain a certificate of notice of intent to marry and a certificate of marriage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Changing the marriage license requirement to a requirement that couples obtain a certificate of notice of intent to marry and a certificate of marriage.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2016-03-09HouseInexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/09/2016 House Journal 23 P. 46
2016-02-17HouseCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/09/2016 (Vote 16-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 14 P. 26
2016-01-20HouseExecutive Session: 01/27/2016 01:00 PM Legislative Office Building 208
2016-01-13HousePublic Hearing: 01/21/2016 11:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building208
2016-02-11HouseIntroduced 01/06/2016 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 4 P. 20

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback