NH HB1592 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 190; Eff. 6/8/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the commissioner of the department of environmental services to review ambient groundwater standards for arsenic.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requiring the commissioner of the department of environmental services to review ambient groundwater standards for arsenic.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-10 - House - Concur (Y: 194 N: 137 NV: 31 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - Laid on Table (Y: 14 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - Laid on Table (Y: 11 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-02-08 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 137 N: 156 NV: 71 Abs: 27) [FAIL]
2018-02-08 - House - Adopt Amendment (Y: 187 N: 104 NV: 73 Abs: 27) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-12HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 190; Eff. 6/8/2018
2018-05-16HouseEnrolled 05/10/2018
2018-05-16SenateEnrolled (In recess 05/10/2018); Senate Journal 18
2018-05-10HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment 1438s and 1926s (Reps. Christensen, McGuire): Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 194-137 05/10/2018
2018-05-03SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1926s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-03SenateSen. Bradley Floor Amendment # 2018-1926s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-03SenateSen. Bradley Moved Ought to Pass; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-03SenateInexpedient to Legislate, Motion Failed, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-03SenateSen. Bradley Moved to Remove From Table, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-03SenatePending Motion Inexpedient to Legislate; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-03SenateSen. Bradley Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 14Y-10N, Motion Adopted; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-03SenateSen. Reagan Moved Laid on Table, Regular Calendar 11Y-13N, Motion Failed; 05/03/2018; Senate Journal 16
2018-05-02SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/03/2018;
2018-05-02SenateSpecial Order to 05/03/2018, Without Objection, Motion Adopted; 05/02/2018 Senate Journal 15
2018-04-25SenateCommittee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate, 05/02/2018; Senate Calendar 19
2018-04-19SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2018-1438s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13
2018-04-19SenateCommittee Amendment # 2018-1438s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 04/19/2018; Senate Journal 13
2018-04-11SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1438s, 04/19/2018; Senate Calendar 17
2018-04-05SenateHearing: 04/10/2018, Room 103, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 16
2018-03-28SenateIntroduced 03/22/2018 and Referred to Energy and Natural Resources; Senate Journal 11
2018-03-22HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 1100h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 29
2018-03-22HouseAmendment # 2018-1100h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/22/2018 House Journal 10 P. 29
2018-03-14HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-1100h for 03/21/2018 (Vote 13-0; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 18
2018-03-02HouseExecutive Session: 03/14/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306
2018-02-22HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/27/2018 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 308
2018-02-14HousePublic Hearing: 02/21/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 306
2018-02-08HouseReferred to Executive Departments and Administration 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 78
2018-02-08HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 0324h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 78
2018-02-08HouseMinority Amendment # 2018-0375h (Rep. Messmer): Amendment Failed Regular Calendar 137-156 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 76
2018-02-08HouseAmendment # 2018-0324h: Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 187-104 02/08/2018 House Journal 3 P. 74
2018-01-31HouseMinority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0375h
2018-01-31HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0324h (NT) for 02/07/2018 (Vote 15-2; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 5 P. 25
2018-01-23House==CONTINUED== Full Committee Work Session: 01/24/2018 09:55 am Legislative Office Building 305
2018-01-17House==RECESSED== Full Committee Work Session: 01/23/2018 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 305
2018-01-11HouseExecutive Session: 01/30/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2018-01-10HouseFull Committee Work Session: 01/16/2018 01:15 PM Legislative Office Building 305
2018-01-03HousePublic Hearing: 01/10/2018 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 305
2017-11-13HouseIntroduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Resources, Recreation and Development House Journal 1 P. 16

New Hampshire State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/bill_status.aspx?lsr=2378&sy=2018&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1592
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&id=1391&txtFormat=html
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=HA&id=1391
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=HA2&id=1391
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=SA&id=1391
Texthttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/billText.aspx?sy=2018&txtFormat=html&v=SA2&id=1391
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=44&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB1592&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1592&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2378
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=45&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB1592&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1592&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2378
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=222&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=HB1592&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1592&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2378
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=223&sy=2018&lb=S&eb=HB1592&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1592&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2378
Roll Callhttp://gencourt.state.nh.us/bill_status/Roll_Calls/billstatus_rcdetails.aspx?vs=232&sy=2018&lb=H&eb=HB1592&sortoption=&txtsessionyear=2018&txtbillnumber=HB1592&ddlsponsors=&lsr=2378

Bill Comments

feedback