NH HB159 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB159
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 66
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-01-03 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 66
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the default service rate for electricity.
Title
Relative to the default service rate for electricity.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 01/03/2024 House Journal 1 P. 66 |
2023-11-14 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate HB159 11/06/2023 (Vote 19-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 49 P. 20 |
2023-10-25 | House | Executive Session: 11/06/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 43 |
2023-09-28 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 10/16/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 39 |
2023-09-05 | House | Full Committee Work Session: 09/26/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 36 |
2023-02-21 | House | Retained in Committee |
2023-02-16 | House | Executive Session: 02/21/2023 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-02-09 | House | Public Hearing: 02/16/2023 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2023-01-03 | House | Introduced 01/04/2023 and referred to Science, Technology and Energy |
Same As/Similar To
HB159 (Carry Over) 2023-09-05 - Full Committee Work Session: 09/26/2023 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 302-304 House Calendar 36