NH HB159 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 288-49 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 27 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-28 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 288-49 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 47
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to condominium association unit owner payments in arrears.
Title
Relative to condominium association unit owner payments in arrears.
Sponsors
Rep. James Webb [R] | Rep. Laura Pantelakos [D] | Rep. Douglas Thomas [R] | Rep. Karel Crawford [R] |
Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Sharon Carson [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-28 - House - ITL (Y: 288 N: 49 NV: 18 Abs: 45) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-28 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 288-49 02/28/2019 House Journal 7 P. 47 |
2019-02-14 | House | Special Order to 2/27/2019 Without Objection House Journal 5 P. 77 |
2019-02-14 | House | Removed from Consent (Rep. Webb) 02/14/2019 House Journal 5 P. 5 |
2019-02-06 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 02/14/2019 (Vote 18-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 11 P. 2 |
2019-01-15 | House | Executive Session: 01/22/2019 01:30 pm Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-15 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 01/22/2019 09:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2019-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/16/2019 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 302 |
2018-12-27 | House | Introduced 01/02/2019 and referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs House Journal 2 P. 39 |