NH HB1589 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 189; Eff. 8/7/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 12 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-06-12 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 189; Eff. 8/7/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to actions against tenants for a caregiver under an agreement for a person with disabilities.
Title
Relative to actions against tenants for a caregiver under an agreement for a person with disabilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Almy [D] | Rep. Suzanne Gottling [D] | Rep. Frank Kotowski [R] | Rep. Charles McMahon [R] |
Sen. Sharon Carson [R] | Sen. John Reagan [R] | Sen. Martha Hennessey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-12 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/08/2018; Chapter 189; Eff. 8/7/2018 |
2018-05-09 | House | Enrolled 05/03/2018 |
2018-05-09 | Senate | Enrolled (In recess 05/03/2018); Senate Journal 17 |
2018-04-26 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 04/26/2018; Senate Journal 14 |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/26/2018; Senate Calendar 18 |
2018-04-10 | Senate | Hearing: 04/17/2018, Room 100, State House, 10:00 am; Senate Calendar 17 |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Introduced 03/08/2018 and Referred to Judiciary; Senate Journal 7 |
2018-03-06 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 0732h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 47 |
2018-03-06 | House | Amendment # 2018-0732h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 47 |
2018-02-28 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2018-0732h for 03/06/2018 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 26 |
2018-02-22 | House | Executive Session: 02/20/2018 Legislative Office Building 208 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/24/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 208 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Judiciary House Journal 1 P. 16 |