NH HB1589 | 2014 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on December 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-02-12 - Reconsider (Rep. Chandler) Motion Failed Div 113-244
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing a committee to study the correlation between current New Hampshire law and the low violent crime rate in this state.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishing a committee to study the correlation between current New Hampshire law and the low violent crime rate in this state.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-02-12 - House - Adopt #14-0467h (Y: 177 N: 175 NV: 20 Abs: 20) [FAIL]
2014-02-12 - House - Adopt #14-0371h (Y: 174 N: 166 NV: 31 Abs: 21) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2014-02-12HouseReconsider (Rep. Chandler) Motion Failed Div 113-244
2014-02-12HouseInexpedient to Legislate (Rep. Chandler) Motion Adopted Div 242-118
2014-02-12HouseOught to Pass with Amendment #0467h Motion Failed Div 165-195
2014-02-12HouseIndefinitely Postpone (Rep. Lambert) Motion Failed Div 133-226
2014-02-12HouseLay on Table (Rep. Butler) Motion Failed Div 173-183
2014-02-12HouseFloor Amendment #2014-0467h (New Title) (Rep. Hoell) Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 177-175
2014-02-12HouseAdopt Amendment #0371h (New Title) Amendment Adopted Regular Calendar 174-166
2014-02-12HouseLay on Table (Rep. Baldasaro) Motion Failed Div 163-165
2014-02-10HouseMinority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate
2014-02-10HouseMajority Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment #2014-0371h (NT) for Feb 12 (Vote 10-8; Regular Calendar); House Calendar 9
2014-01-29HouseExecutive Session: 2/04/2014 2:30 PM Legislative Office Building 302=Continued=
2014-01-28HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 1/30/2014 12:00 PM Legislative Office Building 302
2014-01-22HouseExecutive Session: 1/28/2014 1:15 PM Legislative Office Building 302=Recessed=
2014-01-22HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 1/23/2014 2:15 PM Legislative Office Building 304
2014-01-09HousePublic Hearing: 1/21/2014 1:15 PM Representatives Hall
2013-12-17HouseIntroduced 1/8/2014 and Referred to Commerce and Consumer Affairs

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback