NH HB1587 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/15/2022; Chapter 184; eff.08/14/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-17 - Signed by Governor Sununu 06/15/2022; Chapter 184; eff.08/14/2022 House Journal 14
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to determination of average final compensation under the retirement system and making an appropriation therefor.
Title
Relative to determination of average final compensation under the retirement system and making an appropriation therefor.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-05 - Senate - Ought to Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - OTP (Y: 231 N: 113 NV: 17 Abs: 30) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - House - OTP (Y: 231 N: 113 NV: 17 Abs: 30) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-17 | House | Signed by Governor Sununu 06/15/2022; Chapter 184; eff.08/14/2022 House Journal 14 |
2022-05-24 | House | Enrolled (in recess of) 05/12/2022 House Journal 13 |
2022-05-24 | Senate | Enrolled Adopted, Voice Vote, (In recess 05/12/2022); Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-05 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Motion Adopted; OT3rdg; 05/05/2022; Senate Journal 11 |
2022-05-03 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 05/05/2022; Senate Calendar 18A |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; Refer to Finance Rule 4-5; 04/28/2022; Senate Journal 10 |
2022-04-20 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass, 04/28/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 17 |
2022-04-06 | Senate | Hearing: 04/13/2022, Room 103, State House, 10:05 am; Senate Calendar 15 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Introduced 03/31/2022 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 8 |
2022-03-31 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1169h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-03-31 | House | Amendment # 2022-1169h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/31/2022 House Journal 9 |
2022-03-24 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1169 (Vote 20-1; Regular Calendar) |
2022-03-18 | House | ==CONTINUED== Division I Work Session: 03/22/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 212 |
2022-03-14 | House | ==CANCELLED== Division Work Session: 03/18/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 212 |
2022-03-14 | House | Division Work Session: 03/14/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 212 |
2022-03-09 | House | Executive Session: 03/23/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 210-211 |
2022-03-04 | House | Referred to Finance 02/17/2022 House Journal 4 |
2022-02-18 | House | Ought to Pass: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 232-113 02/17/2022 House Journal 4 |
2022-02-10 | House | Minority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate |
2022-02-10 | House | Majority Committee Report: Ought to Pass (Vote 12-6; Regular Calendar) |
2022-01-26 | House | Subcommittee Work Session: 02/01/2022 08:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2022-01-13 | House | Public Hearing: 01/25/2022 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 302-304 |
2021-12-21 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Executive Departments and Administration |