NH HB1586 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-05-23 - Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 13
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to a likeness of Wentworth Cheswill at the state house.
Title
Relative to a likeness of Wentworth Cheswill at the state house.
Sponsors
Rep. Charlotte DiLorenzo [D] | Rep. Marjorie Smith [D] | Rep. Robert Cushing [D] | Rep. Ellen Read [D] |
Rep. Timothy Horrigan [D] | Rep. Alexis Simpson [D] | Rep. Michael Cahill [D] | Sen. Rebecca Perkins Kwoka [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report; Not Signed Off; Senate Journal 13 |
2022-05-18 | House | Conference Committee Meeting: 05/18/2022 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 305-307 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | President Appoints: Senators Carson, Ricciardi, Watters; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Sen. Carson Accedes to House Request for Committee of Conference, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; 05/12/2022; Senate Journal 12 |
2022-05-10 | House | House Non-Concurs with Senate Amendment 2022-1046s and Requests CofC (Reps. Hill, Wall, Rouillard, Espitia): Motion Adopted Voice Vote 05/05/2022 House Journal 12 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-1046s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Committee Amendment # 2022-1046s, Amendment Adopted, Voice Vote; 03/17/2022; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-1046s, 03/17/2022; Vote 5-0; Consent Calendar; Senate Calendar 11 |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Hearing: 03/09/2022, Room 103, State House, 10:15 am; Senate Calendar 10 |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Introduced 02/24/2022 and Referred to Executive Departments and Administration; Senate Journal 5 |
2022-02-22 | House | Ought to Pass with Amendment 2022-0345h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/17/2022 House Journal 4 |
2022-02-22 | House | Amendment # 2022-0345h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 02/17/2022 House Journal 4 |
2022-02-09 | House | Committee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2022-0345h (Vote 17-0; Regular Calendar) |
2022-02-09 | House | Executive Session: 01/19/2022 02:45 pm Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2022-01-19 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2022 2:45 p.m. Legislative Office Building301-303 |
2021-12-21 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Legislative Administration |