NH HB1585 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on December 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on December 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-16 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to removing the ramp tolls at exit 11 in Hooksett.
Title
Relative to removing the ramp tolls at exit 11 in Hooksett.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Walsh [R] | Rep. Michael Yakubovich [R] | Rep. Sherman Packard [R] | Rep. Steven Smith [R] |
Rep. Stephen Boyd [R] | Rep. Gregory Hill [R] | Rep. Matthew Pitaro [R] | Sen. Harold French [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-16 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 02/16/2022 House Journal 3 |
2022-02-03 | House | Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate (Vote 22-0; Consent Calendar) |
2022-01-28 | House | Executive Session: 01/27/2022 11:00 PM Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-01-27 | House | Executive Session: 01/19/2022 01:00 pm Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2022-01-09 | House | Public Hearing: 01/19/2022 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 201-203 |
2021-12-21 | House | Introduced 01/05/2022 and referred to Public Works and Highways |