NH HB1582 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-29 - Signed by Governor Sununu 07/28/2020; Chapter 34; I. Sec 4/ 5 & 8 Eff: as prov. in Sec. 15 II. Sec 1-2 & 20-21 Eff: 07/01/2021 III. Sec 16-19 Eff: 07/28/2020 IV. Rem. Eff: 09/26/2020
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to free tuition at colleges and universities for children of veterans who are totally and permanently disabled; programs to aid veterans' access to employment, housing, health care, and college degrees; educational assistance for members of the New Hampshire national guard; tuition waivers for children in state foster care or guardianship; and prohibiting higher education institutions from discriminating on the basis of military, law enforcement, or veterans status.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to free tuition at colleges and universities for children of veterans who are totally and permanently disabled; programs to aid veterans' access to employment, housing, health care, and college degrees; educational assistance for members of the New Hampshire national guard; tuition waivers for children in state foster care or guardianship; and prohibiting higher education institutions from discriminating on the basis of military, law enforcement, or veterans status.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-16 - House - Committee Amendment (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-29HouseSigned by Governor Sununu 07/28/2020; Chapter 34; I. Sec 4/ 5 & 8 Eff: as prov. in Sec. 15 II. Sec 1-2 & 20-21 Eff: 07/01/2021 III. Sec 16-19 Eff: 07/28/2020 IV. Rem. Eff: 09/26/2020
2020-07-16SenateEnrolled (In recess 06/29/2020); Senate Journal 9
2020-07-16HouseEnrolled 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 74
2020-06-30HouseHouse Concurs with Senate Amendment (Rep. Myler): Motion Adopted DV 290-36 06/30/2020 House Journal 10 P. 30
2020-06-16SenateOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-1446s, Motion Adopted, Voice Vote; OT3rdg; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-16SenateCommittee Amendment # 2020-1446s, Regular Calendar 24Y-0N, Amendment Adopted; 06/16/2020; Senate Journal 8
2020-06-11SenateCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-1446s, 06/16/2020; Senate Calendar 23
2020-06-05SenateThe following email will be monitored throughout the meeting by someone who can assist with and alert the committee to any technical issues: remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us or call (603-271-3043). Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate6. To view/listen to this hearing on YouTube, use this link: https://www.youtube.com/channel/UCjBZdtrjRnQdmg-2MPMiWrA Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate5. Webinar ID: 943 8186 9248 Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate4. Or iPhone one-tap: 13126266799,,94381869248# or 19292056099,,94381869248# Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate3. To listen via telephone: Dial(for higher quality, dial a number based on your current location): 1-301-715-8592, or 1-312-626-6799 or 1-929-205-6099, or 1-253-215-8782, or 1-346-248-7799, or 1-669-900-6833 Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate2. To submit your testimony to the committee, please send all documents via email to remotesenate@leg.state.nh.us Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05Senate1. To sign-in and/or speak in support or opposition, please register in advance by using this link: https://www.zoom.us/webinar/register/WN_DxJlsaqKRR6W0xV8gOxVTQ Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateMembers of the public may attend using the following links: Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateCommittee members will receive secure Zoom invitations via email. Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateRemote Hearing: 06/10/2020, 01:40 pm, on proposed amendment # 2020-1327s; Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-05SenateRemote Hearing: 06/10/2020, 01:35 pm; Senate Calendar 22
2020-06-01SenateIntroduced 03/12/2020 and Referred to Education and Workforce Development; Senate Journal 8
2020-03-11HouseOught to Pass with Amendment 2020-0896h: Motion Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 18
2020-03-11HouseAmendment # 2020-0896h: Amendment Adopted Voice Vote 03/11/2020 House Journal 7 P. 18
2020-03-02HouseCommittee Report: Ought to Pass with Amendment # 2020-0896h for 03/11/2020 (Vote 20-0; Consent Calendar) House Calendar 10 P. 12
2020-02-25HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/26/2020 09:45 am Legislative Office Building 205
2020-02-18HouseExecutive Session: 02/26/2020 10:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2020-02-18HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/25/2020 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2020-02-05HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/18/2020 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2020-01-28HouseSubcommittee Work Session: 02/05/2020 09:00 am Legislative Office Building 207
2020-01-14HousePublic Hearing: 01/23/2020 11:30 am Legislative Office Building 207
2019-12-03HouseIntroduced 01/08/2020 and referred to Education House Journal 1 P. 27

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback