NH HB1582 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 195-139 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 79
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 195-139 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 79
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relative to the authority of the moderator to verify the device count.
Title
Relative to the authority of the moderator to verify the device count.
Sponsors
Rep. Marjorie Porter [D] | Rep. Michael Cahill [D] | Rep. Janice Schmidt [D] | Rep. Edith DesMarais [D] |
Rep. Marjorie Smith [D] | Rep. James McConnell [R] | Sen. Martha Fuller Clark [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - House - ITL (Y: 195 N: 139 NV: 23 Abs: 34) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Regular Calendar 195-139 03/06/2018 House Journal 6 P. 79 |
2018-02-23 | House | Minority Committee Report: Ought to Pass |
2018-02-23 | House | Majority Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for 03/06/2018 (Vote 14-6; Regular Calendar) House Calendar 9 P. 39 |
2018-02-06 | House | Executive Session: 02/13/2018 11:00 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2018-01-11 | House | Public Hearing: 01/23/2018 10:30 am Legislative Office Building 308 |
2017-11-13 | House | Introduced 01/03/2018 and referred to Election Law House Journal 1 P. 16 |