NH HB1581 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on February 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-22 - House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1201
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relative to procedures for arrest.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relative to procedures for arrest.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-02-22 House Inexpedient to Legislate: Motion Adopted Voice Vote; House Journal 20, PG.1201
2012-02-16 House Committee Report: Inexpedient to Legislate for Feb 22 (Vote 14-0; Consent Calendar); House Calendar 14, PG.799
2012-02-06 House Continued Public Hearing: 2/9/2012 9:45 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 ==Executive Session To Follow==
2012-02-02 House ==CANCELLED== Executive Session: 2/6/2012 10:00 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204
2012-01-03 House Public Hearing: 1/19/2012 10:30 Amendment Legislative Office Building 204 ==RECESSED==
2011-12-16 House Introduced 1/4/2012 and Referred to Criminal Justice and Public Safety; House Journal 7, PG. 360

New Hampshire State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback